Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garcia, Alyssa, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Morrison, Rebecca Blain, against City Of Poway, represented by Holtz, Kimberly R., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Carolyn Caietti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn Caietti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/25/2021 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Alyssa. Refers to: City of Poway
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Garcia, Alyssa. Refers to: City of Poway
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Complaint filed by Garcia, Alyssa. Refers to: City of Poway
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge (Denied) filed by Garcia, Alyssa.
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Garcia, Alyssa.
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Motion - Other filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Notice - Other (Unavailability of Counsel) filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Answer filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020
Date: 2020-11-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Order - Other (Continuing Trial and Related Dates) filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF KIMBERLY R. HOLTZ) filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Garcia, Alyssa.
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF KIMBERLY R. HOLTZ) filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Garcia, Alyssa.
Date: October 05, 2022Proof of Service filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Poway.
Date: July 15, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City of Poway.
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.