Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barron, Leticia, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Guevara, Rodrigo E, against Althof, Tracy, At&T Services Inc, represented by Gunning, Daniel C, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEddie C Sturgeon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Barron, Leticia.
Date: November 04, 2022Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/23/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/23/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Barron, Leticia.
Date: June 28, 2022Notice of Ruling filed by AT&T Services Inc; Althof, Tracy.
Date: June 06, 2022Proof of Service filed by Barron, Leticia.
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Complaint filed by Barron, Leticia. Refers to: AT&T Services Inc; Althof, Tracy
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Barron, Leticia.
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by AT&T Services Inc; Althof, Tracy.
Date: June 06, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barron, Leticia.
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Status Conference Scheduling) filed by Barron, Leticia.
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 06/03/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: June 03, 2022Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by AT&T Services Inc; Althof, Tracy.
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.