Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mountain Meadow Mushroom Farms Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bemis, Gary A, against Pacific Ventures Group Inc; Esa : Pacific Ventures Group Inc Dba Farmers Market Adba San Diego Farmers Outlet, Royalty Foods Partners Llc; Dba : San Diego Farmers Outlet, Royalty Foods Partners Llc; Dba : San Diego Farmers Outlet;Dba : Farmers Outlet, San Diego Farmers Outlet Inc, represented by Solis, Robert, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoren G. Freestone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer filed by PACIFIC VENTURES GROUP INC; ROYALTY FOODS PARTNERS LLC.
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Mountain Meadow Mushroom Farms Inc.
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by PACIFIC VENTURES GROUP INC; ROYALTY FOODS PARTNERS LLC.
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Case Reassignment) filed by Mountain Meadow Mushroom Farms Inc.
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by PACIFIC VENTURES GROUP INC; ROYALTY FOODS PARTNERS LLC.
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/18/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Mountain Meadow Mushroom Farms Inc.
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Mountain Meadow Mushroom Farms Inc.
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Case reassigned from Katz,Keri to Freestone,Loren effective 02/15/2023
Date: February 15, 2023Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: March 01, 2023Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 06/17/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by Mountain Meadow Mushroom Farms Inc.
Date: September 07, 2022Notice of Hearing filed by Mountain Meadow Mushroom Farms Inc.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.