Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Harris, Conrad, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Savaglio, Barbara B, against Hernandez, Ricardo G, represented by Cooper, Benjamin P, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Carolyn Caietti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn Caietti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint filed by Harris, Conrad. Refers to: Hernandez, Ricardo
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Harris, Conrad.
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: August 12, 2021Answer filed by Hernandez, Ricardo G.
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Hernandez, Ricardo G.
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Harris, Conrad.
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Hernandez, Ricardo G.
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/18/2021 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place filed by PLOTKIN, BARRY M.
Date: November 01, 2021Mediator Selection Form filed by Harris, Conrad.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Harris, Conrad. Refers to: Hernandez, Ricardo
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: August 12, 2021Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Harris, Conrad.
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Hernandez, Ricardo G.
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020
Date: 2020-11-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harris, Conrad. Refers to: Hernandez, Ricardo
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Disclosure of Relationship filed by Hernandez, Ricardo G.
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Hernandez, Ricardo G.
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.