Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Banayan, Soufer K, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Weaver, James C, against A Team Finance Inc; Dba : Lndr, Banayan, Shahram, Capital Benefit Inc, Carroll, Anthony, Dumalaog, Cristina, (total of 13) See All represented by Benbow, Shannon, Goldstein, Jason E, Goldstein, Jason E; Hilbert, John Forest, Hilbert, John Forest, Kassabian, Raffi L, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEddie C Sturgeon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Judicial Notice filed by Pacific Premier Bank.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 73]
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Answer filed by Banayan, Shahram.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Gopen, Quinton; Lee, Jivianne; STUART GOPEN.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Pacific Premier Bank Custodian FBO Stuart Gopen IRA 20006425.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Pacific Premier Bank.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Capital Benefit Inc.
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by STUART GOPEN.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by Pacific Premier Bank.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/01/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gopen, Quinton; Capital Benefit Inc; STUART GOPEN; Pacific Premier Bank.
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by Capital Benefit Inc.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 92]
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Capital Benefit Inc; Lee, Jivianne; Gopen, Quinton; STUART GOPEN.
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Original Summons (ON THIRD AMENDED) filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Banayan, Shahram.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Gopen, Quinton; STUART GOPEN; Pacific Premier Bank; Lee, Jivianne.
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Pacific Premier Bank.
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Carroll, Anthony.
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by Capital Benefit Inc.
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Objections filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by A Team Finance Inc; Carroll, Anthony.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Raffi Kassabian) filed by A Team Finance Inc; Carroll, Anthony.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by A Team Finance Inc; Carroll, Anthony received but not filed on 12/10/2021.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed by Lee, Jivianne; Gopen, Quinton; STUART GOPEN.
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Capital Benefit Inc.
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Raffi Kassabian) filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Answer filed by Dumalaog, Cristina.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc received but not filed on 12/10/2021.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/08/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (First Amended) filed by Capital Benefit Inc. Refers to: Banayan, Shahram
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gopen, Stuart; Gopen, Quinton; Lee, Jivianne.
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Banayan, Soufer K received but not filed on 07/08/2022.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 04/29/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Capital Benefit Inc; Gopen, Quinton.
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF JAMES C. WEAVER) filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/11/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Answer filed by Capital Benefit Inc.
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Answer filed by Dumalaog, Cristina.
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Capital Benefit Inc.
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Capital Benefit Inc.
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Answer filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/03/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Answer filed by Gopen, Stuart; Gopen, Quinton; Lee, Jivianne.
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Motion for Preference filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Capital Benefit Inc. Refers to: A Team Finance Inc
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Answer filed by Banayan, Shahram.
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: November 16, 2022Motion for Preference (+ MEMO +DEC) submitted by Banayan, Soufer K rejected on 08/09/2022.
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Response filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Capital Benefit Inc. Refers to: Banayan, Shahram
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF RAFFI KASSABIAN) filed by Carroll, Anthony; A Team Finance Inc.
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/12/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 13]
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00The default filed by Banayan, Soufer K was denied. Refers to: Lee, Jivianne
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 11]
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Banayan, Soufer K. Refers to: Gopen, Quinton
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00The default filed by was denied.
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 14]
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 28]
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First) filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by Capital Benefit Inc.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint (Second) filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Original Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 46]
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Capital Benefit Inc.
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Gopen, Quinton; Lee, Jivianne; STUART GOPEN.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 41]
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Banayan, Soufer K.
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Pacific Premier Bank Custodian FBO Stuart Gopen IRA 20006425.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.