Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Harris, Hollie, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Carpenter, Todd D, against Sheplers Inc, represented by Duffy, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia A. Freeland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint filed by Harris, Hollie. Refers to: Sheplers Inc
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time (12/23/2020) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Todd D Carpenter 04/23/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Motion - Other (04/23/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (04/23/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (12/23/2020) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Todd D Carpenter 12/23/2020) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Transmittal and Receipt of Transferred Case filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Incoming - Out of County Transfer - Case Contents filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proposed Order (04/23/2021) submitted by Harris, Hollie received but not filed on 12/17/2020.
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Stipulation - Other (12/23/2020) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: September 28, 2021Declaration - Other (9/24/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (9/24/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Proposed Order (9/24/2021) submitted by Harris, Hollie received but not filed on 09/14/2021.
Date: September 14, 2021Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/23/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Correspondence (Filed by Neal Isaak) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (5/13) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: September 14, 2021Peremptory Challenge (GRANTED) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees (9/24/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Stipulation - Other (5/13) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: September 23, 2021Proposed Order (12/23/2020) submitted by Harris, Hollie received but not filed on 12/21/2020.
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/13/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/24/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: September 24, 2021Declaration - Other (5/13) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/29/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Judgment (Final Judgment) filed by Harris, Hollie. Refers to: Sheplers Inc
Date: September 27, 2021Proof of Service filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: September 28, 2021Declaration - Other (of Robert Coomes 9/24/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: September 14, 2021Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (5/13) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Proposed Order (5/13) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Motion for Approval of Class Settlement (9/24/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: September 14, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities (9/24/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Bowman, Blaine K. to Cynthia Freeland effective 05/04/2021
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Todd D. Carpenter 9/24/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021
Date: 2021-05-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (9/24/2021) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (5/13) filed by Harris, Hollie.
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Proposed Order (9/24/2021) submitted by Harris, Hollie received but not filed on 08/12/2021.
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.