Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zamora, Silvia, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Recordon, Stephen G; Rooney, Clinton, against Velocity Investments Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer filed by Velocity Investments LLC.
Date: April 06, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: November 12, 2020Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: April 17, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zamora, Silvia. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC
Date: November 12, 2020Original Summons filed by Zamora, Silvia. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.