Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jackson, David, Jackson, Maryanne, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kitay, Howard Alan, Self-Represented, against Acosta, Hernan, Ranas, represented by Flowers, Shelby G., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEddie C Sturgeon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by JACKSON, MARYANNE.
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery filed by JACKSON, MARYANNE.
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/10/2023 10:15:00 AM.
Date: February 10, 2023Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/24/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by JACKSON, DAVID; JACKSON, MARYANNE.
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Complaint filed by JACKSON, MARYANNE; JACKSON, DAVID. Refers to: RANAS; ACOSTA, HERNAN
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Original Summons filed by JACKSON, MARYANNE; JACKSON, DAVID. Refers to: RANAS; ACOSTA, HERNAN
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by JACKSON, MARYANNE; JACKSON, DAVID. Refers to: RANAS; ACOSTA, HERNAN
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by JACKSON, DAVID; JACKSON, MARYANNE.
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by JACKSON, DAVID; JACKSON, MARYANNE.
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney filed by JACKSON, DAVID; JACKSON, MARYANNE.
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by JACKSON, DAVID; JACKSON, MARYANNE.
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Answer filed by RANAS.
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by RANAS.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by RANAS.
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by JACKSON, MARYANNE.
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by JACKSON, DAVID; JACKSON, MARYANNE.
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Answer filed by ACOSTA, HERNAN.
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.