Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barrera, Eddie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Deetman, Gregory E, against Vilasenor, Antonio, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia A. Freeland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Barrera, Eddie.
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/27/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: August 27, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Barrera, Eddie.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Publication filed by Barrera, Eddie. Refers to: VILASENOR, ANTONIO
Date: November 29, 2021Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Barrera, Eddie.
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Barrera, Eddie.
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Complaint filed by Barrera, Eddie. Refers to: VILASENOR, ANTONIO
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barrera, Eddie.
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.