Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Robert P Dahlquist presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert P Dahlquist Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC.
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Hearing (02/26/2021) filed by J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC.
Date: January 15, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC.
Date: November 06, 2020Amended Petition filed by J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC.
Date: November 16, 2020Amended Petition (**2nd AMENDED**) filed by J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC.
Date: January 05, 2021Petition - Other (Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights) filed by J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC.
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed by J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC.
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.