Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Peck, David, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Recordon, Stephen G; Rooney, Clinton, against Velocity Investments Llc, represented by Bhasker, Shalini, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Matthew C. Braner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew C. Braner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint filed by Peck, David. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Peck, David. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Peck, David. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Answer filed by Velocity Investments LLC.
Date: May 03, 2021Case reassigned from Medel,Kenneth to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021
Date: November 11, 2021[Another document for ROA# 8]
Date: March 11, 2021Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.
Date: March 11, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Peck, David.
Date: June 16, 2021ADR Packet generated.
Date: March 11, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.