Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express National Bank Sucessor By Merger To American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael, Lina M, Slinsky, Lourdes R, against Ahrens, Michelle L; Aka : Kinner, Michelle;Aka : Kinner, Michelle L, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia A. Freeland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
[A document for ROA# 1]
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 2]
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Ahrens, Michelle L.
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 12/10/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: December 10, 2021Exhibit List filed by American Express National Bank Sucessor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB.
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/14/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 11/12/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: December 10, 2021Trial Brief filed by American Express National Bank Sucessor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB.
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Answer filed by Ahrens, Michelle L.
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.