Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dyle, Scott D., against Collo, Vicki, Postal Annex Three Seventy 4 Inc, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia A. Freeland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00The default was denied as to Collo, Vicki on Complaint filed by American Express National Bank .
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 20]
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 33]
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does (DOES 1-10) filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/25/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by American Express National Bank. Refers to: Collo, Vicki
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/13/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/13/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 44]
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00The default was denied as to Collo, Vicki on Complaint filed by American Express National Bank .
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 16]
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 11/19/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 05/13/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00The default was denied as to Collo, Vicki on Complaint filed by American Express National Bank .
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/19/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 69]
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Stipulation - Other (To Court Commissioner) filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: November 02, 2022Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00The default was denied as to Collo, Vicki on Complaint filed by American Express National Bank .
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/05/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 91]
Date: November 28, 2022Request for Dismissal of Does (not entered) filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: November 01, 2022Declaration - Other filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: November 28, 2022Proof of Service filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.