Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Beltran, Elizabeth L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Vlahoulis, Demetri J, against Bump, Jason A, represented by Mason, Brian R, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia A. Freeland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint filed by Beltran, Elizabeth l. Refers to: Bump, Jason
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Beltran, Elizabeth l. Refers to: Bump, Jason
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Beltran, Elizabeth l. Refers to: Bump, Jason
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Answer filed by Bump, Jason A.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 14]
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Bump, Jason A.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Bump, Jason A.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Bump, Jason A.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Beltran, Elizabeth l.
Date: July 16, 2021Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.