Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mypoint Credit Union Fka Point Loma Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Locke, Wendy A; Mcallister, David E, against Rogers, Brandon L; Aka : Rogers, Brandan L, Rogers, Tammy L, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union. Refers to: Rogers, Brandon
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 65]
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 52]
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 71]
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Rogers, Brandon
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Rogers, Brandon
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 15]
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (Amendment to Complaint) filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 19]
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 33]
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/04/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court (NOT ENTERED) filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Rogers, Brandon; Rogers, Tammy
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does (Not Entered) filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/06/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 05/20/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: December 16, 2022E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: April 06, 2023Proof of Service by Mail filed by MyPoint Credit Union fka Point Loma Credit Union.
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/16/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: May 26, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.