Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Murphy, Megan, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Kevin A. Enright presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin A. Enright Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | OSC - Failure to File Receipt and Acknowledgement of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account scheduled for 11/17/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in 904 Kevin A. Enright was vacated. | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed by Murphy, Megan. | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re Order to Deposit SD generated. | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability filed by Murphy, Megan; Murphy, Susan. | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed by Murphy, Megan; Murphy, Susan. | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (ITEMIZATION OF COSTS FOR MEGAN MURPHY) filed by Murphy, Megan; Murphy, Susan. | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition to Approve Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability filed by Susan Murphy was granted. | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Compromise of Claim heard 08/06/2020 10:15:00 AM. | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | The Hearing on Compromise of Claim was rescheduled to 08/06/2020 at 10:15:00 AM in 904 before Kevin A. Enright at Central. | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing on Compromise of Claim scheduled for 08/06/2020 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in 904 Kevin A. Enright. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.