Progressive Express Insurance Company,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Nivinskus, Mark R,
against
Wheaton, Debra,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Details for
Progressive Express Insurance Company v. Wheaton, Debra
Case Events for
Progressive Express Insurance Company v. Wheaton, Debra
Date
Type
Description
February 14, 2020
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Court filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company. Refers to: Wheaton, Debra
February 14, 2020
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Progressive Express Insurance Company and against Wheaton, Debra for $ 2231.66, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 294.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 2525.66.
February 14, 2020
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.
February 07, 2020
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (with Dismissal of Does and Supporting Declarations) filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company. Refers to: Wheaton, Debra
February 07, 2020
Docket Event
The default filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company was entered as to Wheaton, Debra on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.
December 13, 2019
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company. Refers to: Wheaton, Debra
October 25, 2019
Docket Event
Summons issued.
October 25, 2019
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.
October 25, 2019
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.
October 24, 2019
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company. Refers to: Wheaton, Debra