Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oulanyah, Ladywinnie Amoo, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Nsonga, Rosette, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Daniel Link presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel Link Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Notice - Other filed by OULANYAH, LADYWINNIE AMOO.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (ADDITIONAL - DENIED) filed by OULANYAH, LADYWINNIE AMOO.
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: November 08, 2019Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 12/09/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: December 09, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED IN WHOLE) filed by OULANYAH, LADYWINNIE AMOO.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Order After Hearing (RE Dismissal) filed by NSONGA, ROSETTE.
Date: February 07, 2020Case reassigned from Rubin,David to Link,Daniel effective 01/11/2020
Date: January 11, 2020Notice - Other (of Representation) filed by NSONGA, ROSETTE.
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 12/06/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: December 06, 2019Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 01/31/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: January 31, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.