Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lefevre, Chris, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Catrambone, Mark, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 12, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case reassigned from Link,Daniel to Campagna,Anthony effective 01/09/2021
Date: January 09, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lefevre, Chris. Refers to: CATRAMBONE, MARK
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Exhibit List filed by CATRAMBONE, MARK.
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case reassigned from Campagna,Anthony to C-61 effective 01/28/2022.
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Case reassigned from Rubin,David to Link,Daniel effective 01/11/2020
Date: 2020-01-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 10/15/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal SD generated.
Date: April 25, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Lefevre, Chris.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-61 to C-74 effective 02/15/2023.
Date: February 15, 2023Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 08/16/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.