Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Anaya, Joshua C.; Anaya, Joshua C.; Nelson, John J filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald L. Styn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald L. Styn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial365 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions203 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint filed by Finkelstein, Howard D. Refers to: Krinsk, Jeffrey
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Answer filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 11]
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R. Refers to: Finkelstein, Lorin
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R. Refers to: Finkelstein, Howard
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R. Refers to: Finkelstein, Howard; Finkelstein, Lorin
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Finkelstein, Howard D; Finkelstein, Lorin J.
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Finkelstein, Howard D; Finkelstein, Lorin J.
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Response filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R. Refers to: Finkelstein, Howard
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R. Refers to: Finkelstein, Lorin
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (First) filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R. Refers to: Finkelstein, Howard
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/09/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 09/27/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/27/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R; Krinsk, Jeffrey R; Krinsk, Jeffrey R; Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Demurrer (to first amended cross complaint) filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/27/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/06/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of John J Nelson in support of motion) filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 11/27/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Reply filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 11/27/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate statement in support of motion) filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/28/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Motion - Other (to compel Lauren Legrant's attendance at deposition) filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/17/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Civil Court Trial rescheduled to 05/21/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.
Date: 2020-05-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Mark L Knutson in support of motion) filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Answer filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/30/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: October 30, 2020Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Finkelstein, Howard D.
Date: November 17, 2020Declaration - Other filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (motion, statement, declarations, proposed order) filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Marcy Krinsk in support of motion) filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jeffrey R Krinsk in support of motion) filed by Krinsk, Jeffrey R.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.