Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chung, Lisa Hird; Thornton, Janelle R filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Chung, Lisa Hird; Thornton, Janelle R, against Rodriguez, Octavio, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel Link presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel Link Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions678 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.
Date: 2018-10-08T00:00:00Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/16/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in 903 David Rubin.
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-10-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crab Pub Inc. Refers to: Rodriguez, Octavio
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice to Appear filed by Crab Pub Inc.
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Claims) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Crab Pub Inc; Le, Nicky.
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/25/2019 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Crab Pub Inc; Le, Nicky.
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/16/2018 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 08/02/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 08/21/2019 01:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Opposition - Other (Opposition to Request for an Order Shortening Time) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 08/06/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Objections filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice - Other (Second Notice of Claims) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Objections (OBJECTION TO AND MOTION TO QUASH CIVIL SUBPOENA) filed by Crab Pub Inc; Le, Nicky.
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Order - Other (SETTLEMENT DISCLOSURE FORM) filed by Crab Pub Inc; Rodriguez, Octavio; Le, Nicky.
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 04/19/2019 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 05/01/2019 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Crab Pub Inc; Le, Nicky.
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/02/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jessica Fry) filed by Labor Commissioner State of California.
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case reassigned from Rubin,David to Link,Daniel effective 01/11/2020
Date: 2020-01-11T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Teri L. Smith #7949) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Objections filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Witness List (Joint) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio; Crab Pub Inc; Le, Nicky.
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Order After Hearing (re: granting ex parte application for hearing dates) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice - Other (OF MOTION TO CORRECT JUDGEMENT) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Brywn Whatford #14234) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Proposed Order (granting ex parte) submitted by Rodriguez, Octavio received but not filed on 08/24/2020.
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jessica Fry in support of ex parte) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Objections filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Statement of Decision (Proposed) submitted by Rodriguez, Octavio received but not filed on 12/13/2019.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Objections filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Brief - Other (PLAINTIFF OCTAVIO RODRIGUEZS Post Trial Brief) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Statement of Decision (Tentative) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/26/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 87]
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 10/30/2019 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 10/07/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 08/23/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Report - Other (Joint trial readiness report) filed by Crab Pub Inc; Le, Nicky; Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Trial Brief (Post Trial) filed by Crab Pub Inc; Le, Nicky.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Labor Commissioner State of California received but not filed on 09/01/2020.
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 70]
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint) filed by Crab Pub Inc; Le, Nicky; Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: January 29, 2021Opposition - Other (memorandum in opposition) filed by Le, Nicky.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Rodriguez, Octavio; Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: October 07, 2020Order - Other (Granting Motion for Attorney Fees) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: October 07, 2020Notice - Other (of Motion for Attorney Fees) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Order - Other (Granting Motion to Correct Judgment) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: October 07, 2020Proof of Service filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/07/2020 09:00:00 AM. (As Amended)
Date: October 07, 2020Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: October 14, 2021Notice - Other (Of Court Order Granting Attorney Fees) filed by Rodriguez, Octavio.
Date: October 13, 2020Declaration - Other (declaration re: Lisa Hird) filed by Le, Nicky.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment submitted by Rodriguez, Octavio rejected on 12/22/2020.
Date: December 22, 2020Declaration - Other (declaration re: Nicky Le) filed by Le, Nicky.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.