Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hennessee, Ashley filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Castro, Reynaldo, Cm Management & Investments Llc, Eric Ray Castro Trustee Of The Castro Family Trust Dated December 21 2017, Platt, Rosa Maria, Rodriguez, Enrique, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn S. Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial156 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time706 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Answer filed by Platt, Michael David.
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Castro, Reynaldo
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 35]
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 42]
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Rodriguez, Enrique
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/20/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 56]
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Amended Answer filed by Platt, Michael David.
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice - Other (OF INTENT TO LODGE DOCUMENTS) filed by Platt, Michael David.
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/07/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 02/08/2019 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Judgment filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (Received 3/11/2019) submitted by Platt, Michael David rejected on 03/18/2019.
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Default SD generated.
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice RE: Fee for Record on Appeal (D075692) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Default vacated.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: March 04, 2020Disbursement of Clerk's Trust Fund (D075692) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: August 16, 2019[Another document for ROA# 91]
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Chronological SD generated.
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Default (D075692) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Platt, Michael
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Order (Court of Appeal Order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: January 02, 2020Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: March 10, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.