Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Megli, Kathryn M filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Jeffrey B. Barton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey B. Barton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions207 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time277 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for SAN DIEGO REGIONAL WATER QUALITY CONTROL BOARD and against WARREN, PAUL for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00. | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to WARREN, PAUL . | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Remittitur (RESPONDENT TO RECOVER COSTS) filed by WARREN, PAUL. Refers to: SAN DIEGO REGIONAL WATER QUALITY CONTROL BOARD | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to SAN DIEGO REGIONAL WATER QUALITY CONTROL BOARD. | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal of Appeal (D073430) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Failure to Clear Default filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: WARREN, PAUL | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Default filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: WARREN, PAUL | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal and Election to Proceed by Clerk's and Reporter's Transcripts filed by WARREN, PAUL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.