Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patterson, Erin E, Vlachos, Michael, against Cervantes, Claudia, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald F. Frazier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
[Another document for ROA# 22]
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Discover Bank.
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 10/09/2023 10:15:00 AM.
Date: October 09, 2023Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023.
Date: March 18, 2023Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Cervantes, Claudia
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Cervantes, Claudia
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Discover Bank.
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Cervantes, Claudia
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Answer filed by Cervantes, Claudia.
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in 1604 .
Date: September 25, 2023Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Discover Bank.
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Discover Bank.
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Cervantes, Claudia.
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/15/2022 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: October 09, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Cervantes, Claudia
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
Date: 2020-01-11T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-61 to Ronald Frazier effective 02/22/2022
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: June 28, 2022Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Cervantes, Claudia
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case reassigned from Frazier,Ronald to Freestone,Loren effective 07/30/2022
Date: July 30, 2022Case reassigned from C-27 to 903 effective 01/13/2018.
Date: 2018-01-13T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Cervantes, Claudia
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Clerk (Not Entered) filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Cervantes, Claudia
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-07 to C-27 effective 09/23/2017.
Date: 2017-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.