We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Capital One Bank Usa Na Vs Organo

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Organo, Marc, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Randa Trapp presiding.

Case Details for Capital One Bank Usa Na v. Organo, Marc

Judge

Randa Trapp Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

June 02, 2017

Category

Civil - Limited

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

San Diego County, CA

Matter Type

Collections

Case Cycle Time

304 days

Parties for Capital One Bank Usa Na v. Organo, Marc

Plaintiffs

Capital One Bank Usa Na

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Bleier, Elizabeth A

Defendants

Organo, Marc

Case Documents for Capital One Bank Usa Na v. Organo, Marc

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00

Case initiation form printed.

Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00

Case Events for Capital One Bank Usa Na v. Organo, Marc

Type Description
Docket Event Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Organo, Marc, on 06/26/2017, has expired.
Docket Event Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 10:20:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.
Docket Event Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Docket Event Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Capital One Bank USA NA.
Docket Event Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Organo, Marc .
Docket Event Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Docket Event Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Docket Event Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/16/2018 at 10:20AM before Judge Randa Trapp.
Docket Event Minute Order
Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/05/2018 10:20:00 AM.
Docket Event Notice to Filing Party SD
Notice - Other (Case Management Conference and Order) submitted by Capital One Bank USA NA rejected on 12/22/2017.
See all events