Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Hsbc Mortgage Services Inc, Frank, Michael, Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, Durr, Julie, Chambers, Roberta L, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald F. Frazier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions175 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by San Diego County Treasurer-Tax Collector.
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Answer filed by San Diego County Treasurer-Tax Collector.
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 91]
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Spain, Donald.
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Disclaimer filed by Spain, Donald.
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/04/2016 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/03/2017 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/19/2017 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust.
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Case reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018
Date: December 29, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.