Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Woodlawn Colonial Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Limbag, Efren, against Roman, Thania, Ramos, Juan Valdiviezo, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 26, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions31 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time96 days |
Original Summons filed by Woodlawn Colonial LP. Refers to: Ramos, Juan; Roman, Thania
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Woodlawn Colonial LP. Refers to: Ramos, Juan; Roman, Thania
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 16]
Date: August 05, 2015Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Woodlawn Colonial LP.
Date: September 30, 2015Writ of Possession issued.
Date: August 18, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.