Gardner Pool Company Inc; Dba : Gardner Pool Plastering,
filed a(n)
General Property -
Property
case
represented by
Greer, James A,
against
Christopherson, Melinda,
Christopherson, Edward,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Lorna Alksne presiding.
Case Details for
Gardner Pool Company Inc; Dba : Gardner Pool Plastering v. Christopherson, Melinda
, et al.
Case Events for
Gardner Pool Company Inc; Dba : Gardner Pool Plastering v. Christopherson, Melinda
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
November 09, 2012
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Gardner Pool Company Inc.
October 18, 2012
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gardner Pool Company Inc. Refers to: Christopherson, Edward
October 18, 2012
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Edward Christopherson) filed by Gardner Pool Company Inc. Refers to: Christopherson, Edward
September 27, 2012
Docket Event
Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action (Pertains to 10384 Spruce Grove Avenue, San Diego, CA 92131) filed by Gardner Pool Company Inc.
September 05, 2012
Docket Event
Summons issued.
September 05, 2012
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.
September 04, 2012
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gardner Pool Company Inc. Refers to: Christopherson, Edward; Christopherson, Melinda
September 04, 2012
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Gardner Pool Company Inc. Refers to: Christopherson, Edward; Christopherson, Melinda
September 04, 2012
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Gardner Pool Company Inc. Refers to: Christopherson, Edward; Christopherson, Melinda