We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Boyd, Mary Jane ,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
against
Deborah Seiler San Diego County Registrar Of Voters ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Lorna Alksne presiding.
Filing Date
August 22, 2012
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Defendants
Deborah Seiler San Diego County Registrar Of Voters
Case Events for
Boyd, Mary Jane v. Deborah Seiler San Diego County Registrar Of Voters
Date
Type
Description
August 31, 2012
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by BOYD, MARY JANE. Refers to: DEBORAH SEILER SAN DIEGO COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS
Get Document
August 31, 2012
Docket Event
Ex Parte scheduled for 09/05/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 Lorna Alksne was vacated.
August 29, 2012
Docket Event
Ex Parte scheduled for 09/05/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 Lorna Alksne.
August 29, 2012
Docket Event
The Ex Parte was rescheduled to 09/05/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in C-64 before Lorna Alksne at Central.
August 27, 2012
Docket Event
Proof of Service (Re: Petition for Writ of Mandate [Steve Danon served]) filed by BOYD, MARY JANE.
Get Document
August 27, 2012
Docket Event
Proof of Service (Re: Petition for Writ of Mandate [Deborah Seiler served]) filed by BOYD, MARY JANE.
Get Document
August 23, 2012
Docket Event
Ex Parte scheduled for 08/30/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 Lorna Alksne.
August 22, 2012
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BOYD, MARY JANE. Refers to: DEBORAH SEILER SAN DIEGO COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS; DANON, STEVE
Get Document
August 22, 2012
Docket Event
Petition - Other filed by BOYD, MARY JANE. Refers to: DEBORAH SEILER SAN DIEGO COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS; DANON, STEVE
Get Document
August 22, 2012
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Alksne, Lorna.
Judge: Alksne Lorna
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.