We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Luque Marino Llp ,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Swiderski, James ,
against
Western Titanium Inc ,
Schroeder, Dan ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Lorna Alksne presiding.
Filing Date
June 29, 2012
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Events for
Luque Marino Llp v. Western Titanium Inc
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
July 16, 2012
Docket Event
Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/10/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 Lorna Alksne was vacated.
July 06, 2012
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Luque Marino LLP.
Get Document
July 02, 2012
Docket Event
Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/10/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 Lorna Alksne.
June 29, 2012
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Alksne, Lorna.
Judge: Alksne Lorna
June 29, 2012
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Luque Marino LLP. Refers to: Schroeder, Dan; Western Titanium Inc
Get Document
June 29, 2012
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Luque Marino LLP. Refers to: Schroeder, Dan; Western Titanium Inc
Get Document
June 29, 2012
Docket Event
Summons issued.
June 29, 2012
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.
Get Document
June 29, 2012
Docket Event
Complaint filed by Luque Marino LLP. Refers to: Schroeder, Dan; Western Titanium Inc
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.