Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Knutson, Mark L filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joan M. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoan M. Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions178 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time528 days |
Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Krinsk, Marcy. Refers to: Luxury Link LLC
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Krinsk, Marcy. Refers to: Luxury Link LLC
Date: 2012-11-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/04/2013 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/04/2013 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.
Date: 2012-11-21T00:00:00Complaint filed by Krinsk, Marcy. Refers to: Luxury Link LLC
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2012-11-28T00:00:00Demurrer (5/3/13 motion) filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Trapp, Randa to Joan Lewis effective 11/19/2012
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Krinsk, Marcy. Refers to: Luxury Link LLC
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Declaration of Prejudice CCP 170.6 (Order signed by Judge R. Trapp) filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2012-11-14T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-04-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Destination Hotels & Resorts Inc; Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Destination Hotels & Resorts Inc; Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-04-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition to Demurrer) filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-04-22T00:00:00Objections (to Ex Parte for Order Setting Hearing on Motion to Compel) filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Destination Hotels & Resorts Inc; Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/26/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Destination Hotels & Resorts Inc; Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (In support of Opposition with exhibits A-G) filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-04-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint (Second) filed by Krinsk, Marcy. Refers to: Luxury Link LLC
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 05/03/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-05-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Destination Hotels & Resorts Inc; Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-07-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-04-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-07-03T00:00:00Order - Other submitted by Luxury Link LLC received but not filed on 07/03/2013.
Date: 2013-07-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/17/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-07-17T00:00:00Attachment - Other (Compendium of Authorities) filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-07-03T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 66]
Date: 2013-07-24T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (to Demurrer) filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-09-16T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to Request for Judicial Notice) filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (in support of Opposition with exhibit A) filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-09-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-09-20T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatory Number 2) filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of William R Resits) filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 100]
Date: December 10, 2013[Another document for ROA# 91]
Date: 2013-10-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-11-15T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2013-11-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/10/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-11-05T00:00:00Judgment of Dismissal filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 101]
Date: December 20, 2013Judgment of Dismissal submitted by Luxury Link LLC rejected on 11/05/2013.
Date: 2013-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Krinsk, Marcy.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Judgment of Dismissal submitted by Luxury Link LLC rejected on 01/15/2014.
Date: January 15, 2014Notice - Other (of Entry of Revised Judgment of Dismissal) filed by Luxury Link LLC.
Date: March 12, 2014Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: April 17, 2014Order for Dismissal of Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: February 14, 2014Notice of Default SD generated.
Date: January 08, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.