Discover Bank,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Osterman, Peter R,
against
Vanhaeren, Vincent,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with David G. Brown presiding.
Case Details for
Discover Bank v. Vanhaeren, Vincent
Case Events for
Discover Bank v. Vanhaeren, Vincent
Date
Type
Description
January 12, 2012
Docket Event
Abstract of Judgment issued.
November 29, 2011
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Discover Bank and against Vanhaeren, Vincent for $ 14918.40, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 449.50, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 15367.90.
November 29, 2011
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Vanhaeren, Vincent
November 23, 2011
Docket Event
Application for Entry of Judgment (CLERK) filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Vanhaeren, Vincent
November 23, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Vanhaeren, Vincent
November 23, 2011
Docket Event
Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Vanhaeren, Vincent
November 23, 2011
Docket Event
Default entered as to Vanhaeren, Vincent on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Discover Bank .
October 14, 2011
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Vanhaeren, Vincent
October 04, 2011
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.
Judge: Stern Jacqueline
October 04, 2011
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.