We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb Federal Savings Bank ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Bachman, Robert L ,
against
Morcos, Leonardo ; Aka : Morcos, Leonardo R ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with David B. Oberholtzer presiding.
Filing Date
September 20, 2010
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Case Cycle Time
2446 days
Plaintiffs
American Express Bank Fsb Federal Savings Bank
Defendants
Morcos, Leonardo ; Aka : Morcos, Leonardo R
Case Events for
American Express Bank Fsb Federal Savings Bank v. Morcos, Leonardo ; Aka : Morcos, Leonardo R
Date
Type
Description
June 01, 2017
Docket Event
Case File Contents as of 05/31/17 - volume 1 of 1
December 07, 2010
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 01/28/2011 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 David B. Oberholtzer.
Get Document
December 07, 2010
Docket Event
OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 01/28/2011 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 David B. Oberholtzer was vacated.
December 01, 2010
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express Bank FSB Federal Savings Bank. Refers to: Morcos, Leonardo
September 20, 2010
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express Bank FSB Federal Savings Bank. Refers to: Morcos, Leonardo
September 20, 2010
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by American Express Bank FSB Federal Savings Bank. Refers to: Morcos, Leonardo
September 20, 2010
Docket Event
Complaint filed by American Express Bank FSB Federal Savings Bank. Refers to: Morcos, Leonardo
September 20, 2010
Docket Event
Summons issued.
September 20, 2010
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Oberholtzer, David.
Judge: Oberholtzer David
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.