We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada N A ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Winn, Brian N ,
against
Polk, Gloria ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
August 16, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
71 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Case Cycle Time
2481 days
Case Events for
Hsbc Bank Nevada N A v. Polk, Gloria
Date
Type
Description
June 01, 2017
Docket Event
Case File Contents as of 05/31/17 - volume 1 of 1
April 22, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A.
April 08, 2011
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Clerk submitted by HSBC Bank Nevada N A rejected on 04/08/2011. Refers to: Polk, Gloria
Get Document
March 07, 2011
Docket Event
Default entered as to Polk, Gloria on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A .
March 07, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default and Clerk Judgment Received for Processing
March 07, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Polk, Gloria
February 03, 2011
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Request for Entry of Default submitted by HSBC Bank Nevada N A rejected on 02/03/2011. Refers to: Polk, Gloria
Get Document
October 26, 2010
Docket Event
** DEFAULT CLERK JUDGMENT RECEIVED **
October 26, 2010
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal of Does filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A.
September 03, 2010
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Polk, Gloria
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.