We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada N A ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Walsh, Mark D ,
against
Hagihara, Jun ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
June 04, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
242 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Case Cycle Time
2538 days
Case Events for
Hsbc Bank Nevada N A v. Hagihara, Jun
Date
Type
Description
May 16, 2017
Docket Event
Case File Contents as of 05/16/17 - volume 1 of 1
August 11, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A.
July 21, 2011
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Court submitted by HSBC Bank Nevada N A rejected on 07/21/2011. Refers to: Hagihara, Jun
Get Document
June 01, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default and/or Court Judgment Received for Processing
June 01, 2011
Docket Event
Application for Entry of Judgment filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Hagihara, Jun
April 04, 2011
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Clerk submitted by HSBC Bank Nevada N A rejected on 04/04/2011. Refers to: Hagihara, Jun
Get Document
February 01, 2011
Docket Event
DEFAULT CLERK JUDGMENTS RECEIVED
February 01, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (and dismissal of DOES) filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Hagihara, Jun
February 01, 2011
Docket Event
Default entered as to Hagihara, Jun on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A .
June 11, 2010
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Hagihara, Jun
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.