Golden State Flooring A Wholly Owned Division Of Je Higgins Lumber Company,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Phillips, John W,
against
Godwin, Mark,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Joel M. Pressman presiding.
Case Details for
Golden State Flooring A Wholly Owned Division Of Je Higgins Lumber Company v. Godwin, Mark
Case Events for
Golden State Flooring A Wholly Owned Division Of Je Higgins Lumber Company v. Godwin, Mark
Date
Type
Description
May 23, 2017
Docket Event
Case File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 1 of 1
May 02, 2011
Docket Event
OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 06/10/2011 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.
May 02, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Golden State Flooring a wholly owned division of JE Higgins Lumber Company.
April 13, 2011
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 06/10/2011 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman.
January 28, 2011
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Clerk submitted by Golden State Flooring a wholly owned division of JE Higgins Lumber Company rejected on 01/28/2011. Refers to: Godwin, Mark
October 14, 2010
Docket Event
Default entered as to Godwin, Mark on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Golden State Flooring a wholly owned division of JE Higgins Lumber Company .
October 14, 2010
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (and Dismissal of Does) filed by Golden State Flooring a wholly owned division of JE Higgins Lumber Company. Refers to: Godwin, Mark
October 14, 2010
Docket Event
DEFAULT CLERK JUDGMENT RECEIVED
August 24, 2010
Docket Event
OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 08/27/2010 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.
August 23, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate of Service filed by Golden State Flooring a wholly owned division of JE Higgins Lumber Company.