We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Graves, Mishaela J ,
against
Robinson, Sheila ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
October 22, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
54 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Case Cycle Time
2117 days
Case Events for
Midland Funding Llc v. Robinson, Sheila
Date
Type
Description
August 08, 2016
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Midland Funding LLC.
May 12, 2015
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.
June 26, 2014
Docket Event
Substitution of Attorney filed by Midland Funding LLC.
November 06, 2012
Docket Event
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Get Document
November 06, 2012
Docket Event
Order Determining Claim of Exemption filed by Midland Funding LLC.
November 02, 2012
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (Civil) heard 11/02/2012 09:00:00 AM.
Get Document
November 01, 2012
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (Civil) published.
October 09, 2012
Docket Event
Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Robinson, Sheila
October 09, 2012
Docket Event
Claim of Exemption - Notice of Hearing filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Robinson, Sheila
October 01, 2012
Docket Event
Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (Civil) scheduled for 11/02/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.