Brandon Street Mini Storage Llc,
filed a(n)
Civil - Limited
case
represented by
Jewell, Joseph T Iii,
against
Hill, Norma Ruth,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with David G. Brown presiding.
Case Details for
Brandon Street Mini Storage Llc v. Hill, Norma Ruth
Case Events for
Brandon Street Mini Storage Llc v. Hill, Norma Ruth
Date
Type
Description
January 07, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Brandon Street Mini Storage LLC. Refers to: Hill, Norma
December 16, 2010
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Entry of Judgment submitted by Brandon Street Mini Storage LLC rejected on 12/16/2010.
December 06, 2010
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGMENT RECEIVED 12/6/10.
November 30, 2010
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Entry of Judgment submitted by Brandon Street Mini Storage LLC rejected on 11/30/2010.
November 15, 2010
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGMENT RECEIVED 11/15/10.
November 09, 2010
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default filed by Brandon Street Mini Storage LLC. Refers to: Hill, Norma
November 09, 2010
Docket Event
The default filed by Brandon Street Mini Storage LLC was entered as to Hill, Norma Ruth on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.
October 21, 2010
Docket Event
Proof of Service (RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC-CERTIFIED MAIL) filed by Brandon Street Mini Storage LLC. Refers to: Hill, Norma
October 19, 2010
Docket Event
Summons issued.
October 19, 2010
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Brandon Street Mini Storage LLC. Refers to: Hill, Norma