Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael, Lina M, against Lu, Trien ; Aka : Lu, Trien T;Aka : Trien, Lu;Aka : Thuc-Lu, Trien;Aka : Lu, Trien P;Dba : Lu'S Japanese Car Specialist, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with David G. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid G. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions101 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time336 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED | |
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by American Express Bank, FSB. Refers to: Lu, Trien | |
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by American Express Bank, FSB. Refers to: Lu, Trien | |
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT RECEIVED 4/9/10. | |
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by American Express Bank, FSB. | |
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event | The default filed by American Express Bank, FSB was entered as to Lu, Trien on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used. | |
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by American Express Bank, FSB. Refers to: Lu, Trien | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Brown, David.
Judge: Brown David |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by American Express Bank, FSB. Refers to: Lu, Trien |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.