Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Ramos Jr, Juan, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 14, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time92 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Palisades Collection LLC. Refers to: Ramos, Juan | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Ramos, Juan Jr on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Palisades Collection LLC . | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Palisades Collection LLC. | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Palisades Collection LLC. Refers to: Ramos, Juan | |
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by Palisades Collection LLC. Refers to: Ramos, Juan | |
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Palisades Collection LLC. Refers to: Ramos, Juan | |
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-03. | |
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Palisades Collection LLC. Refers to: Ramos, Juan | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Palisades Collection LLC. Refers to: Ramos, Juan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.