Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hoffmann, Martin, against Crowder, Heather K, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 05, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time223 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Crowder, Heather | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Crowder, Heather K on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A . | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Crowder, Heather | |
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department E-21. | |
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Crowder, Heather | |
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Case details updated. | |
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Crowder, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.