Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hoffmann, Martin, against Ignacio, Julie L; Aka : Iqwalio, Julie L;Aka : Ignierp, Julie L, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Adrienne A. Orfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdrienne A. Orfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Refers to: Ignacio, Julie | |
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. | |
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Orfield, Adrienne.
Judge: Orfield Adrienne |
|
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (JULIE L IGNACIO AKA JULIE L. IQWALIO AKA JULIE L. IGNIERP) filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Refers to: Ignacio, Julie | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Refers to: Ignacio, Julie | |
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Case details updated. | |
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-12. | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Refers to: Ignacio, Julie | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Refers to: Ignacio, Julie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.