We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Usa Discounters Credit Llc ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Grundon, Bryan M ,
against
Estrada, Veronica ,
Estrada, Angel ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with William S. Cannon presiding.
Filing Date
December 18, 2007
Last Refreshed
November 19, 2020
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
72 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Case Cycle Time
3348 days
Plaintiffs
Usa Discounters Credit Llc
Case Events for
Usa Discounters Credit Llc v. Estrada, Veronica
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
February 16, 2017
Docket Event
Case File Contents as of 02/14/17 - volume 1 of 1
March 12, 2015
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by USA Discounters Credit LLC.
July 22, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution issued.
August 11, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied (San Diego) filed by USA Discounters Credit LLC. Refers to: Estrada, Angel; Estrada, Veronica
June 02, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution issued.
March 12, 2009
Docket Event
Substitution of Attorney filed by USA Discounters Credit LLC.
February 20, 2009
Docket Event
Matter was taken off calendar. No proof of service filed.
February 20, 2009
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 02/20/2009 09:15:00 AM.
Get Document
February 20, 2009
Docket Event
Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) scheduled for 02/20/2009 at 09:15:00 AM at South County in S-02 .
February 20, 2009
Docket Event
Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) reassigned to for 02/20/2009 at 09:15:00 AM in S-02 at South County.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.