We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Zide, Flint C ,
against
Tran, Tina T ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
November 14, 2007
Last Refreshed
November 17, 2020
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
474 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Case Events for
Bank Of America Na v. Tran, Tina T
Date
Type
Description
March 02, 2009
Docket Event
Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.
March 02, 2009
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service heard 02/27/2009 08:45:00 AM.
Get Document
January 09, 2009
Docket Event
DISMISSAL submitted by fIA CARD rejected on 1/9/09.
January 05, 2009
Docket Event
OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service reassigned to for at 08:45:00 AM in at North County.
January 05, 2009
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from N-12 to N-03 effective 01/02/2009.
Get Document
November 05, 2008
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 02/27/2009 at 08:45:00 AM at North County in N-12 .
Get Document
February 07, 2008
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Bank of America, N.A. (USA). Refers to: Tran, Tina
February 04, 2008
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from N-04 to N-12 effective 02/02/2008.
Get Document
November 29, 2007
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department N-04.
November 29, 2007
Docket Event
Summons issued.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.