Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Horne, Roxanna Gail, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Horne, Jeffrey Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Israels, Valli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsraels, Valli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJune 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Limited Scope Representation | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Migrated Images | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.