Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baptista, April D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Baptista, Jeff S, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Siefkin, Susan D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSiefkin, Susan D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 02, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Amended Petition Filed | |
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition | |
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Denied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.