Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Landrum, Marcia, filed a(n) Succession of Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Griffin, John E, Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGriffin, John E, Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2005 |
CategoryDetermination Of Succession To Real Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeSuccession of Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.