Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ahumada, Gloria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Adhumada, Demetrio, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
December 15, 2004 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.