Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Cadle Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Vlock, Stephen, against Angelica Mitchell, Paul Wagner, Vanessa Mitchell-Wagner, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Fraud) |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2021CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 04, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: October 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 06, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
October 27, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
October 21, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
October 06, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 06, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
October 04, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
October 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 04, 2021 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
September 27, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.