Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Suzanne Ciulla, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 13, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 25, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 15, 2021AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 25, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 25, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 25, 2022EXECUTION
Date: August 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
August 30, 2022 |
EXECUTION Returned Income Execution - Wholly Unsatisfied |
||
May 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
May 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
May 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
May 25, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
May 25, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
May 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
May 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
May 25, 2022 | JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.